PA HB829 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 7, 1961 (P.L.518, No.268), known as the Delaware River Basin Compact, in pollution control, further providing for enforcement; and, in general provisions, further providing for effect on riparian rights.
Title
Amending the act of July 7, 1961 (P.L.518, No.268), known as the Delaware River Basin Compact, in pollution control, further providing for enforcement; and, in general provisions, further providing for effect on riparian rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2019-03-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-26 | House | First consideration |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |