PA HB840 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-21)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 13
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 13
Summary
An Act designating the Main Street bridge on State Route 69 in the Borough of Sugar Grove, Warren County, as the AMVETS POW-MIA Memorial Bridge.
Title
An Act designating the Main Street bridge on State Route 69 in the Borough of Sugar Grove, Warren County, as the AMVETS POW-MIA Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-06-30 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-06-30 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-06-29 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-06-29 | Signed in House | |
2007-06-28 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-25 | Second consideration | |
2007-06-19 | First consideration | |
2007-06-19 | Reported as committed | |
2007-04-30 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2007-04-25 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-04-25 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-04-23 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-04-23 | Second consideration | |
2007-04-18 | Removed from table | |
2007-04-17 | Laid on the table | |
2007-04-17 | First consideration | |
2007-04-17 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-19 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=840 |