PA HB857 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-14)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-26 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-26 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, providing for contribution for Veterans' Trust Fund.
Title
In personal income tax, providing for contribution for Veterans' Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01264 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01264 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-26 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-15 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to FINANCE |