PA HB922 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-09-24 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on March 29 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-09-24 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act establishing an Urban Educators Recruitment Program in the Department of Education; and making an appropriation.
Title
An Act establishing an Urban Educators Recruitment Program in the Department of Education; and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-09-24 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-09-24 | Removed from table | |
2007-09-17 | Laid on the table | |
2007-09-17 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-27 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-06-27 | First consideration | |
2007-06-27 | Reported as amended | |
2007-04-17 | Re-referred to EDUCATION | |
2007-04-17 | Reported with request to re-refer to EDUCATION | |
2007-03-29 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=922 |