PA HB945 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-23 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-23 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in support matters generally, further providing for liability for support; and, in child custody, further providing for consideration of criminal conviction.
Title
In support matters generally, further providing for liability for support; and, in child custody, further providing for consideration of criminal conviction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2014-06-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-11 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-05-07 | House | Removed from table |
2013-09-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-09-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-18 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-18 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-18 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |