PA HB994 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in gross receipts tax, further providing for imposition of tax.
Title
In gross receipts tax, further providing for imposition of tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Seth Grove [R] | Rep. Keith Greiner [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Rep. Christopher Harris [R] |
Rep. Francis Ryan [R] | Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 994 PN 2909, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 994 PN 2909, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A05246 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 994 PN 2909, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A05246 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Senate | Act No. 52 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-05-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2018-04-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-03-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-03-14 | House | Second consideration |
2018-03-13 | House | Removed from table |
2018-01-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-01-23 | House | First consideration |
2018-01-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred to FINANCE |