PA HR169 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-16)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-11-13 - Removed from table
Status: Introduced on March 29 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-11-13 - Removed from table
Summary
A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to study the feasibility of a local property tax freeze and the gradual elimination of local property taxes for senior citizens; to perform a cost analysis of such a freeze and reduction; to determine the consequences of such a freeze and reduction on local taxing bodies and on the Commonwealth; and to make recommendations on alternative financing methods for school districts.
Title
A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to study the feasibility of a local property tax freeze and the gradual elimination of local property taxes for senior citizens; to perform a cost analysis of such a freeze and reduction; to determine the consequences of such a freeze and reduction on local taxing bodies and on the Commonwealth; and to make recommendations on alternative financing methods for school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-11-13 | Removed from table | |
2008-11-13 | Laid on the table | |
2008-07-01 | Removed from table | |
2008-07-01 | Laid on the table | |
2008-06-04 | Reported as amended | |
2007-03-29 | Referred to FINANCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=169 |