PA HR318 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-11 - Laid on the table
Status: Introduced on June 5 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-11 - Laid on the table
Summary
A Resolution urging the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) to ban the importation of all wheat gluten products from China until China fully cooperates with the FDA's investigation into the adulteration of the food supply and opens all of its food processing plants for United States inspection.
Title
A Resolution urging the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) to ban the importation of all wheat gluten products from China until China fully cooperates with the FDA's investigation into the adulteration of the food supply and opens all of its food processing plants for United States inspection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-12-11 | Laid on the table | |
2007-11-15 | Removed from table | |
2007-11-15 | Laid on the table | |
2007-10-04 | Removed from table | |
2007-10-04 | Laid on the table | |
2007-07-12 | Removed from table | |
2007-07-12 | Laid on the table | |
2007-06-26 | Reported as committed | |
2007-06-05 | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL AFFAIRS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=318 |