PA HR352 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-11 - Laid on the table
Status: Introduced on June 26 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-11 - Laid on the table
Summary
A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to study alternatives to the liquid fuels tax for purposes of funding the Commonwealth's transportation infrastructure and to report its findings to the General Assembly.
Title
A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to study alternatives to the liquid fuels tax for purposes of funding the Commonwealth's transportation infrastructure and to report its findings to the General Assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-12-11 | Laid on the table | |
2007-11-19 | Removed from table | |
2007-11-19 | Laid on the table | |
2007-10-15 | Removed from table | |
2007-10-15 | Laid on the table | |
2007-07-13 | Removed from table | |
2007-07-13 | Laid on the table | |
2007-06-27 | Reported as committed | |
2007-06-26 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=352 |