PA HR38 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-9)
Status: Passed on February 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-03 - Adopted (199-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-9)
Status: Passed on February 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-03 - Adopted (199-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution urging the Governor to issue a proclamation to observe January 30, 2015, as "Pennsylvanians with Disabilities Day" in Pennsylvania, and requesting the Governor to appoint a committee to investigate and recommend how the Commonwealth can best commemorate "Pennsylvanians with Disabilities Day" on an annual basis to recognize residents with disabilities who have distinguished themselves and this Commonwealth in the spirit of the late President Franklin Delano Roosevelt.
Title
Urging the Governor to issue a proclamation to observe January 30, 2015, as "Pennsylvanians with Disabilities Day" in Pennsylvania, and requesting the Governor to appoint a committee to investigate and recommend how the Commonwealth can best commemorate "Pennsylvanians with Disabilities Day" on an annual basis to recognize residents with disabilities who have distinguished themselves and this Commonwealth in the spirit of the late President Franklin Delano Roosevelt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-03 - House - House Floor: HR 38 PN 154 (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-03 | House | Adopted (199-0) |
2015-01-28 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to HEALTH |