PA HR401 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-27 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-27 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution opposing any effort to implement a trinational political, governmental entity among the United States, Canada and Mexico; opposing the Security and Prosperity Partnership of North America and initiatives pursued in conjunction with the partnership that threaten the sovereignty of the United States; and opposing a North American Union.
Title
Opposing any effort to implement a trinational political, governmental entity among the United States, Canada and Mexico; opposing the Security and Prosperity Partnership of North America and initiatives pursued in conjunction with the partnership that threaten the sovereignty of the United States; and opposing a North American Union.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | Removed from table | |
2010-09-27 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-23 | Removed from table | |
2010-06-23 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-28 | Removed from table | |
2010-04-28 | Laid on the table | |
2010-02-09 | Reported as committed | |
2009-07-08 | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL AFFAIRS |