PA HR417 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-24 - Adopted (201-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution recognizing the month of September 2019 as "National Suicide Prevention Awareness Month" and September 10, 2019, as "World Suicide Prevention Day" in Pennsylvania.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the month of September 2019 as "National Suicide Prevention Awareness Month" and September 10, 2019, as "World Suicide Prevention Day" in Pennsylvania.

Sponsors

Rep. Kerry Benninghoff [R]Rep. Jennifer O'Mara [D]Rep. Stephen Barrar [R]Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R]
Rep. Ryan Bizzarro [D]Rep. Rosemary Brown [R]Rep. Frank Burns [D]Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D]
Rep. Joseph Ciresi [D]Rep. Lynda Schlegel Culver [R]Rep. Tina Davis [D]Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D]
Rep. Gene DiGirolamo [R]Rep. Maria Donatucci [D]Rep. Joseph Emrick [R]Rep. Garth Everett [R]
Rep. Melinda Fee [R]Rep. Dan Frankel [D]Rep. Robert Freeman [D]Rep. John Galloway [D]
Rep. Mark Gillen [R]Rep. Keith Greiner [R]Rep. Marcia Hahn [R]Rep. Liz Hanbidge [D]
Rep. Timothy Hennessey [R]Rep. David Hickernell [R]Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D]Rep. Movita Johnson-Harrell [D]
Rep. Mike Jones [R]Rep. Robert Kauffman [R]Rep. Stephen Kinsey [D]Rep. Brian Kirkland [D]
Rep. William Kortz [D]Rep. Mark Longietti [D]Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R]Rep. Steven Malagari [D]
Rep. Robert Matzie [D]Rep. Jeanne McNeill [D]Rep. Natalie Mihalek [R]Rep. David Millard [R]
Rep. Brett Miller [R]Rep. Dan Moul [R]Rep. Ed Neilson [D]Rep. Donna Oberlander [R]
Rep. Danielle Otten [D]Rep. Eddie Pashinski [D]Rep. Jeffrey Pyle [R]Rep. Harry Readshaw [D]
Rep. Greg Rothman [R]Rep. Francis Ryan [R]Rep. Christopher Sainato [D]Rep. Stanley Saylor [R]
Rep. Michael Schlossberg [D]Rep. Louis Schmitt [R]Rep. Meghan Schroeder [R]Rep. Peter Schweyer [D]
Rep. Curtis Sonney [R]Rep. Craig Staats [R]Rep. Wendi Thomas [R]Rep. Marcy Toepel [R]
Rep. Perry Warren [D]Rep. David Zimmerman [R]Rep. Thomas Murt [R]Rep. Todd Polinchock [R]
Rep. Malcolm Kenyatta [D]Rep. Brian Sims [D]

Roll Calls

2019-09-24 - House - House Floor: HR 417 PN 2245 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-24HouseAdopted (201-0)
2019-09-18HouseReported as committed
2019-09-17HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES
2019-06-25HouseINTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback