PA HR648 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-15)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Adopted (192-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-15)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Adopted (192-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the bravery and professionalism of the Philadelphia Police Department during the events of August 14, 2019.
Title
Recognizing the bravery and professionalism of the Philadelphia Police Department during the events of August 14, 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - House - House Floor: HR 648 PN 3069 (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Adopted (192-0) |
2020-01-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |