PA HR866 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the week of May 10 through May 16, 2020, as "National Hospital Week" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing the week of May 10 through May 16, 2020, as "National Hospital Week" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HR 866 PN 3739 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | House | Adopted (202-0) |
2020-05-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-05-12 | House | Referred to HEALTH |