PA SB101 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 1, 1945 (P.L.1242, No.428), known as the State Highway Law, in rural State highway system and State highways in cities, boroughs and towns, further providing for improvement, reconstruction and maintenance.
Title
In rural State highway system and State highways in cities, boroughs and towns, further providing for improvement, reconstruction and maintenance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-09-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |