PA SB1126 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-10-22 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on October 15 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-10-22 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 28, 1953 (P.L.723, No.230), known as the Second Class County Code, further regulating contracts and purchases.
Title
An Act amending the act of July 28, 1953 (P.L.723, No.230), known as the Second Class County Code, further regulating contracts and purchases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-10-22 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-10-17 | First consideration | |
2007-10-17 | Reported as committed | |
2007-10-15 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1126 |