PA SB166 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-29 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-29 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the capital budget for the fiscal year 2019-2020 and for limitation on redevelopment assistance capital projects; and making a related repeal.
Title
Providing for the capital budget for the fiscal year 2019-2020 and for limitation on redevelopment assistance capital projects; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 166 PN 1721, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED-RECONSIDER (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 166 PN 1721, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: SB 166 PN 1431, CONCUR (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: SB 166 PN 1431, FP (Y: 107 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: SB 166 PN 985, 2019 A4179, TURZAI (Y: 107 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 166 PN 985, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 166 PN 1721, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED-RECONSIDER (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 166 PN 1721, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: SB 166 PN 1431, CONCUR (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: SB 166 PN 1431, FP (Y: 107 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: SB 166 PN 985, 2019 A4179, TURZAI (Y: 107 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 166 PN 985, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-29 | House | Act No. 25 |
2020-05-29 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-05-28 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-05-28 | House | Signed in House |
2020-05-28 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-05-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (202-0) |
2020-05-28 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-05-28 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-05-28 | House | In the House |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (50-0) |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Vote by which Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments reconsidered |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (49-1) |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-12-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-12-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (107-89) |
2019-12-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-12-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-12-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-11-20 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-11-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-19 | House | In the House |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |