PA SB211 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Re-referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Re-referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 27 (Environmental Resources) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in environmental protection, providing for decommissioning of solar energy facilities.
Title
In environmental protection, providing for decommissioning of solar energy facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] | Sen. Michele Brooks [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - House - House Consumer Protection, Technology And Utilities: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 211 PN 180, Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 211 PN 180, Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Re-referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2023-04-25 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION, TECHNOLOGY AND UTILITIES |
2023-03-08 | House | In the House |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (36-13) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-02-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |