PA SB297 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Act No. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Act No. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1984 (P.L.1140, No.223), known as the Oil and Gas Act, further providing for well reporting requirements.
Title
Further providing for well reporting requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-16 - Senate - SB 297 PN 1632, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - SB 297 PN 1632, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - SB 297 PN 982, 2009 A5484, GEORGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-08 - Senate - SB 297 PN 982, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - SB 297 PN 1632, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - SB 297 PN 982, 2009 A5484, GEORGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-08 - Senate - SB 297 PN 982, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Act No. 15 | |
2010-03-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-17 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-03-17 | Signed in House | |
2010-03-16 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-03-16 | Senate concurred in House amendments | |
2010-03-15 | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2010-03-10 | In the Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-01-26 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2010-01-25 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-07-08 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-07-08 | Removed from table | |
2009-07-07 | Laid on the table | |
2009-07-07 | First consideration | |
2009-07-07 | Reported as committed | |
2009-06-09 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY | |
2009-06-08 | In the House | |
2009-06-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-03 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-01 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-05-06 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-05-05 | First consideration | |
2009-05-05 | Reported as amended | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |