PA SB297 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-06 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-06 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 5, 1936 (2nd Sp.Sess., 1937 P.L.2897, No.1), known as the Unemployment Compensation Law, further providing for qualifications required to secure compensation and for ineligibility for compensation.
Title
Further providing for qualifications required to secure compensation and for ineligibility for compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Senate - SB 297 PN 928, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2013-04-30 | House | In the House |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-04-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |