PA SB317 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, in taxation and finance, further providing for annual budget.
Title
In taxation and finance, further providing for annual budget.
Sponsors
Sen. John Gordner [R] | Sen. Richard Alloway [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] |
Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. John Blake [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: SB 317 PN 296, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 317 PN 296, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: SB 317 PN 296, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 317 PN 296, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-27 | House | Act No. 109 |
2019-11-27 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-11-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-11-21 | House | Signed in House |
2019-11-21 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-11-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-0) |
2019-11-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-20 | House | Second consideration |
2019-11-19 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-30 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-01 | House | In the House |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |