PA SB325 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in sales and use tax, further providing for exclusions from tax.
Title
In sales and use tax, further providing for exclusions from tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-03-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |