PA SB341 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-26 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-26 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 53 (Municipalities Generally) and 65 (Public Officers) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in municipal authorities, further providing for money of authority and for competition in award of contracts; and, in ethics standards and financial disclosure, further providing for investigations by commission.
Title
In municipal authorities, further providing for money of authority and for competition in award of contracts; and, in ethics standards and financial disclosure, further providing for investigations by commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 341 PN 475, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 341 PN 475, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-10-26 | House | First consideration |
2016-10-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-10-03 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-09-28 | House | In the House |
2016-09-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-10-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |