PA SB394 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-27 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-27 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of January 19, 1968 (1967 P.L.992, No.442), entitled, "An act authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and the local government units thereof to preserve, acquire or hold land for open space uses," further providing for definitions and for local taxing options.
Title
Amending the act of January 19, 1968 (1967 P.L.992, No.442), entitled, "An act authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and the local government units thereof to preserve, acquire or hold land for open space uses," further providing for definitions and for local taxing options.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-02-04 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |