PA SB42 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1970 (P.L.128, No.49), entitled "An act granting to the Governor of the Commonwealth the sole authority for regulating the display of the flag of the United States from any public ground or building and from any ground or building of certain other institutions," further providing for the display of the official POW/MIA flag on Commonwealth grounds or buildings.
Title
Amending the act of March 4, 1970 (P.L.128, No.49), entitled "An act granting to the Governor of the Commonwealth the sole authority for regulating the display of the flag of the United States from any public ground or building and from any ground or building of certain other institutions," further providing for the display of the official POW/MIA flag on Commonwealth grounds or buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |