PA SB438 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-22 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-22 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 7, 1947 (P.L.1368, No.542), known as the Real Estate Tax Sale Law, further providing for the title of the act; and, in sale of property, providing for county demolition and rehabilitation fund.
Title
Further providing for the title of the act; and, in sale of property, providing for county demolition and rehabilitation fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |