PA SB496 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-13 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-13 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in burglary and other criminal intrusion, further providing for the offense of criminal trespass.
Title
In burglary and other criminal intrusion, further providing for the offense of criminal trespass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 496 PN 496, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-06-12 | House | In the House |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |