PA SB50 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-17 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-17 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing an industrial hemp industry in this Commonwealth; conferring powers and imposing duties on the Department of Agriculture and the Legislative Reference Bureau; prescribing penalties; and establishing an account.
Title
Establishing an industrial hemp industry in this Commonwealth; conferring powers and imposing duties on the Department of Agriculture and the Legislative Reference Bureau; prescribing penalties; and establishing an account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 50 PN 1597, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2016-03-16 | House | In the House |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Amended on second consideration |
2015-10-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |