PA SB501 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for protection of paychecks of certain workers and for the collection of political contributions.
Title
Providing for protection of paychecks of certain workers and for the collection of political contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05664 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House State Government: To Table until January 27, 2016 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-01-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05664 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House State Government: To Table until January 27, 2016 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 501 PN 1315, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 501 PN 497, A3592, EICHELBERGER AMENDMENT NO. A-3592 (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 501 PN 497, A3594, RAFFERTY AMENDMENT NO. A-3594 TO EICHELBERGER AMENDMENT NO. A-3592 (Y: 9 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 501 PN 497, A300, EICHELBERGER AMENDMENT NO. A-0300 (Y: 24 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 501 PN 497, CORMAN MOTION TO RECONSIDER AMENDMENT A-0300 (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 501 PN 497, COSTA MOTION TO REREFER TO THE COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS (Y: 19 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-01-26 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05664 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House State Government: To Table until January 27, 2016 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-01-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05664 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House State Government: To Table until January 27, 2016 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 501 PN 1315, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 501 PN 497, A3592, EICHELBERGER AMENDMENT NO. A-3592 (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 501 PN 497, A3594, RAFFERTY AMENDMENT NO. A-3594 TO EICHELBERGER AMENDMENT NO. A-3592 (Y: 9 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 501 PN 497, A300, EICHELBERGER AMENDMENT NO. A-0300 (Y: 24 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 501 PN 497, CORMAN MOTION TO RECONSIDER AMENDMENT A-0300 (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 501 PN 497, COSTA MOTION TO REREFER TO THE COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS (Y: 19 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-25 | House | Removed from table |
2016-10-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-07-12 | House | Removed from table |
2016-07-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-09 | House | Removed from table |
2016-06-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-04-11 | House | Removed from table |
2016-04-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-01-27 | House | Removed from table |
2016-01-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-01-26 | House | First consideration |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-10-28 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-10-14 | House | In the House |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (26-23) |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-02-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |