PA SB508 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in tobacco products tax, further providing for definitions and for incidence and rate of tax; and imposing a vapor products tax.
Title
In tobacco products tax, further providing for definitions and for incidence and rate of tax; and imposing a vapor products tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-04-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |