PA SB537 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-05-29 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-05-29 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the offense of fraudulent airbags.
Title
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the offense of fraudulent airbags.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-05-29 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2007-05-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-05-07 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-04-30 | Amended on second consideration | |
2007-04-17 | First consideration | |
2007-04-17 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-19 | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=537 |