PA SB559 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-18 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-18 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in licensing of drivers, further providing for schedule of convictions and points; in rules of the road in general, further providing for speed timing devices; and in powers of department and local authorities, further providing for State and local powers.
Title
In licensing of drivers, further providing for schedule of convictions and points; in rules of the road in general, further providing for speed timing devices; and in powers of department and local authorities, further providing for State and local powers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-18 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-05-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |