PA SB595 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 57 (Notaries Public) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in revised uniform law on notarial acts, further providing for authority to perform notarial act, providing for notarial acts performed by remotely located individuals and further providing for notification regarding performance of notarial act on electronic record and selection of technology.
Title
In revised uniform law on notarial acts, further providing for authority to perform notarial act, providing for notarial acts performed by remotely located individuals and further providing for notification regarding performance of notarial act on electronic record and selection of technology.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Folmer [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] |
Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. James Brewster [D] | Sen. Andrew Dinniman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 595 PN 1654, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Amendment A06827 to Amendment A06459 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: AmendmentA06459 as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Amendment A06827 to Amendment A06459 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: AmendmentA06459 as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2018-06-22 | House | In the House |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Re-committed to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |