PA SB619 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 22, 1937 (P.L.1987, No.394), known as The Clean Streams Law, in general provisions and public policy, further providing for definitions; and, in other pollutions and potential pollution, providing for notice of discharge endangering health or the environment.
Title
In general provisions and public policy, further providing for definitions; and, in other pollutions and potential pollution, providing for notice of discharge endangering health or the environment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-17 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-17 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A07654 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 619 PN 857, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-17 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A07654 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 619 PN 857, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-11-18 | House | First consideration |
2020-11-18 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2019-06-26 | House | In the House |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (26-24) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |