PA SB691 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 28, 1995 (P.L.89, No.18), known as the Conservation and Natural Resources Act, in renaming Department of Environmental Resources and defining rulemaking authority of Department of Environmental Protection, repealing provisions relating to Department of Environmental Protection and providing for Department of Environmental Services; and making editorial changes.
Title
In renaming Department of Environmental Resources and defining rulemaking authority of Department of Environmental Protection, repealing provisions relating to Department of Environmental Protection and providing for Department of Environmental Services; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] | Sen. David Argall [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 691 PN 854, Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 691 PN 715, 2023 A638, YAW Amendment No. A-0638 (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 691 PN 715, 2023 A638, YAW Amendment No. A-0638 (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2023-06-07 | House | In the House |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (28-22) |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (28-22) |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-05-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |