PA SB701 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 71
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 71
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing and directing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey certain lands and improvements situate in the City of Allentown and the City of Bethlehem, Lehigh County, through a competitive solicitation process; and making a related repeal.
Title
Authorizing and directing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey certain lands and improvements situate in the City of Allentown and the City of Bethlehem, Lehigh County, through a competitive solicitation process; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 701 PN 1025, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 701 PN 1025, FP (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02084 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 701 PN 847, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 701 PN 1025, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 701 PN 1025, FP (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02084 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 701 PN 847, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Act No. 71 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-06-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-1) |
2019-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-24 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-24 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-11 | House | In the House |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |