PA SB828 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 29, 2012 (P.L.549, No.54), known as the Stroke System of Care Act, providing for Statewide stroke registry.
Title
Providing for Statewide stroke registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-24 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Adopt Amendment A02651 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-10-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |