PA SB836 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Act No. 73
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Act No. 73
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school health services, providing for sudden cardiac arrest and electrocardiogram testing; and making a repeal.
Title
In school health services, providing for sudden cardiac arrest and electrocardiogram testing; and making a repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-14 - House - House Floor: SB 836 PN 1844, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 836 PN 1844, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: SB 836 PN 1664, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A05229 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 836 PN 1265, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 836 PN 1844, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: SB 836 PN 1664, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A05229 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 836 PN 1265, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | House | Act No. 73 |
2020-07-23 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-07-15 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-07-15 | House | Signed in House |
2020-07-15 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-07-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (201-0) |
2020-07-14 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-07-14 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-07-13 | House | In the House |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (49-0) |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2020-07-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-07-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-07-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-04 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-04 | House | Second consideration |
2020-04-30 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-29 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-10-31 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2019-10-30 | House | In the House |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-10-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |