PA SB857 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-07-03 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-07-03 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 6, 1956 (1955 P.L.1414, No.465), known as the Second Class County Port Authority Act, further providing for audit requirements and for board members.
Title
An Act amending the act of April 6, 1956 (1955 P.L.1414, No.465), known as the Second Class County Port Authority Act, further providing for audit requirements and for board members.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Jane Earll [R] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] |
Sen. Jane Orie [R] | Sen. Dominic Pileggi [R] | Sen. Joseph Scarnati [R] | Sen. Donald White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-07-03 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2007-06-30 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-29 | Amended on third consideration | |
2007-06-27 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-06-25 | Re-reported as amended | |
2007-06-20 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-19 | First consideration | |
2007-06-19 | Reported as committed | |
2007-05-31 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=857 |