PA SB959 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.233, No.64), known as The Controlled Substance, Drug, Device and Cosmetic Act, further providing for authority to control.
Title
Further providing for authority to control.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 959 PN 1168, Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2023-10-25 | House | In the House |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (30-20) |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-10-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |