PA SB968 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-10)
Status: Enrolled on July 16 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 52
Status: Enrolled on July 16 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 52
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 20, 2002 (P.L.154, No.13), known as the Medical Care Availability and Reduction of Error (Mcare) Act, providing for reduction and prevention of health care-associated infection and for long-term care nursing facilities.
Title
An Act amending the act of March 20, 2002 (P.L.154, No.13), known as the Medical Care Availability and Reduction of Error (Mcare) Act, providing for reduction and prevention of health care-associated infection and for long-term care nursing facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-07-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-07-16 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-07-15 | Signed in House | |
2007-07-14 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-07-14 | Senate concurred in House amendments | |
2007-07-14 | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed | |
2007-07-14 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2007-07-14 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-07-14 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-07-12 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-07-12 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-07-05 | Removed from table | |
2007-07-05 | Laid on the table | |
2007-07-05 | First consideration | |
2007-07-05 | Reported as amended | |
2007-06-27 | Referred to INSURANCE | |
2007-06-26 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-25 | Re-reported as amended | |
2007-06-20 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-20 | Re-reported as amended | |
2007-06-18 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-18 | Second consideration | |
2007-06-13 | First consideration | |
2007-06-13 | Reported as amended | |
2007-06-11 | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=968 |