PA SB968 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-16 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-16 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for use of seclusion.
Title
Providing for use of seclusion.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Boscola [D] | Sen. Andrew Dinniman [D] | Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] | Sen. Michael O'Pake [D] |
Sen. Jane Orie [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. Barry Stout [D] | Sen. Anthony Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-16 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-30 | First consideration | |
2009-06-30 | Reported as amended | |
2009-06-17 | Referred to EDUCATION |