PA SR448 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11)
Status: Passed on October 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-26 - Adopted (194-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11)
Status: Passed on October 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-26 - Adopted (194-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution commemorating the 200th session of the General Assembly.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution commemorating the 200th session of the General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: SR 448 PN 2133, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 448 PN 2133 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 448 PN 2133 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-26 | House | Adopted (194-0) |
2016-10-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-10-20 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-10-18 | House | In the House |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Adopted (48-0) |
2016-10-17 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-10-13 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |