RI H5053 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts property located at 122 North Main Street in the city of Woonsocket from the provision requiring it to be located a certain distance from objectors/schools/churches regarding the issuance of retail liquor licenses.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/04/2019) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2019) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/13/2019) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2019-02-26 | House | House read and passed |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/26/2019) |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-02-01 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/07/2019) |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/24/2019) |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |