RI H5313 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires issuance of utility bill credits to customers of electrical/gas/cable TV providers for service interruption for 168 hours within 30 day period.
Title
Duties Of Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2019) |
2019-02-12 | House | Meeting postponed (02/12/2019) |
2019-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5313.pdf |