RI H5360 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Amending The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The Years 2019-2020 (proposes An Amendment To The House Rules Which Would Allow Closed Session Meetings With Respect To All Sexual Harassment And Discrimination Complaints And Investigations To Maintain The Confidentiality Of All Complaints.)
Title
House Resolution Amending The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The Years 2019-2020 (proposes An Amendment To The House Rules Which Would Allow Closed Session Meetings With Respect To All Sexual Harassment And Discrimination Complaints And Investigations To Maintain The Confidentiality Of All Complaints.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Rules Committee |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5360.pdf |