RI H5578 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Meeting postponed (06/26/2019)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Meeting postponed (06/26/2019)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a fee increase for filing an action in district court, superior court and family court.
Title
Procedure Generally - Fees
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Christopher Millea [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Meeting postponed (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5578.pdf |