RI H5620 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes the provisions regarding reimbursement by the state for conventional public housing students. Provides permanent foundation education aid funding for services and instructional services for students residing in conventional public housing units.
Title
The Education Equity And Property Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5620.pdf |