RI H5662 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the overtime exemption for firefighters unless they are paid at the rate of one and one-half (1 1/2) times their regular rate for all hours worked in excess of forty-two (42) hours.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-05-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/09/2019) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/07/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Labor |
2019-04-09 | House | House read and passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/09/2019) |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/03/2019) |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |