RI H5830 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires master and journeyperson plumbers to complete a course of continuing education prior to the renewal or reinstatement of their license as determined by the board of examiners.
Title
Plumbers And Irrigators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Plumbers and irrigators approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Passage (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Passage (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-25 | House | House passed Sub B as amended in concurrence |
2015-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B as amended (floor amendment) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2015) |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2015) |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Labor |
2015-05-12 | House | House passed Sub A |
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/12/2015) |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-04-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/09/2015) |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2015) |
2015-03-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |